EP4238887 - CLOSURE SYSTEM FOR A DRUG CONTAINER AND DRUG CONTAINER WITH A CLOSURE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inductio AG Obere Steingrubenstrasse 6 4500 Solothurn / CH | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koller, Horst 8730 Uznach / CH | [2023/36] | Representative(s) | Tergau & Walkenhorst Intellectual Property GmbH Lurgiallee 12 60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/36] | Tergau & Walkenhorst Patentanwälte PartGmbB Lurgiallee 12 60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 22160078.6 | 03.03.2022 | [2023/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4238887 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/38, B65B65/00, B65B3/00, B65B3/04, B65B39/12, B65D51/00, A61J1/06, A61J1/14, A61M39/10, A61M39/16 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
B65D51/002 (EP);
A61J1/1406 (EP);
A61J1/1425 (EP);
B65B3/003 (EP);
B65B3/04 (EP);
B65B39/12 (EP);
B65D47/38 (EP);
A61J1/065 (EP);
A61M2039/1072 (EP);
A61M39/165 (EP);
B65B65/003 (EP);
B65D2251/0015 (EP);
B65D2251/009 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/36] | B65D51/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] |
Former [2023/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSCHLUSSSYSTEM FÜR EINEN MEDIKAMENTENBEHÄLTER SOWIE MEDIKAMENTENBEHÄLTER MIT EINEM VERSCHLUSSSYSTEM | [2023/36] | English: | CLOSURE SYSTEM FOR A DRUG CONTAINER AND DRUG CONTAINER WITH A CLOSURE SYSTEM | [2023/36] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FERMETURE POUR UN RÉCIPIENT À MÉDICAMENTS, AINSI QUE RÉCIPIENT À MÉDICAMENTS DOTÉ D'UN SYSTÈME DE FERMETURE | [2023/36] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 05.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4954149 (FULLEMANN JAMES S [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US5202093 (CLOYD WILLLIAM C [US]) [Y] 1-9 * column 1, lines 35-50; figures 1-7 * * column 5, lines 1-27 *; | [Y]DE9306796U (PHARMA-GUMMI WIMMER WEST GMBH) [Y] 1-9 * figures 1-10 *; | [I]US2004141886 (PY DANIEL [US], et al) [I] 10 * figures 33-38,43,44, 45, 47 *; | [A]US2013270820 (PY DANIEL [US]) [A] 10* paragraph [0061]; figure 5 *; | [A]US2018148232 (CASTILLO EDWARD [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO2020252243 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 1-10 * figures 12-25 * | by applicant | EP20200209611 |