EP4053803 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETECTING PERSONS IN A LOCATION, AND VEHICLE USING SUCH A SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SNCF Voyageurs 9 Rue Jean Philippe Rameau 93200 Saint-Denis / FR | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AFANOU, Sitou 72000 LE MANS / FR | 02 /
MARTEAU, Tony 72100 LE MANS / FR | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | IPAZ Bâtiment Platon Parc Les Algorithmes 91190 Saint-Aubin / FR | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 22160098.4 | 03.03.2022 | [2022/36] | Priority number, date | FR20210002126 | 04.03.2021 Original published format: FR 2102126 | [2022/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4053803 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06V20/52, G06V10/145, G06V40/10 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
G06V40/103 (EP);
G06V10/145 (EP);
G06V20/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/13] |
Former [2022/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ERKENNUNG VON PERSONEN AN EINEM ORT UND FAHRZEUG, DAS EIN SOLCHES SYSTEM VERWENDET | [2022/36] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETECTING PERSONS IN A LOCATION, AND VEHICLE USING SUCH A SYSTEM | [2022/36] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE DETECTION DE PERSONNE DANS UN LIEU, ET VEHICULE METTANT EN OEUVRE UN TEL SYSTEME | [2022/36] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/13] | 20.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.03.2025 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2019220655 (PRASHANT MAHESHWARI [IN], et al); | [A]US10636173 (BEACH ALLISON [US], et al); | [A]US2020349376 (RAVEENDRAN VIJAYALAKSHMI [US]) |