EP4053359 - JACK ADAPTED TO BE INSERTED INTO THE THICKNESS OF A STRUCTURAL ELEMENT, AND METHOD FOR INSERTING SAID JACK IN SAID STRUCTURAL ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Next Innovation in Engineering S.r.l. Via Marcora 52 20097 San Donato Milanese (Milano) / IT | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VANZI, Ivo 80123 Napoli / IT | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Savoca, Agatino, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia, 8 10152 Torino / IT | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 22160247.7 | 04.03.2022 | [2022/36] | Priority number, date | IT20210005075 | 04.03.2021 Original published format: IT202100005075 | [2022/36] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4053359 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4053359 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E04G23/02, B66F3/08 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
E04G23/0229 (EP);
B66F3/08 (EP);
E04G23/0244 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] |
Former [2022/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HEBEVORRICHTUNG ZUM EINFÜHREN IN DIE DICKE EINES BAUTEILS UND VERFAHREN ZUM EINFÜHREN DER HEBEVORRICHTUNG IN DAS BAUTEIL | [2022/36] | English: | JACK ADAPTED TO BE INSERTED INTO THE THICKNESS OF A STRUCTURAL ELEMENT, AND METHOD FOR INSERTING SAID JACK IN SAID STRUCTURAL ELEMENT | [2022/36] | French: | VÉRIN ADAPTÉ POUR ÊTRE INSÉRÉ DANS L'ÉPAISSEUR D'UN ÉLÉMENT STRUCTUREL, ET PROCÉDÉ D'INSERTION DUDIT VÉRIN DANS LEDIT ÉLÉMENT STRUCTUREL | [2022/36] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 06.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 28.02.2024 | HR | 28.02.2024 | PL | 28.02.2024 | NO | 28.05.2024 | RS | 28.05.2024 | GR | 29.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/35] | ES | 28.02.2024 | |
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
NO | 28.05.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 28.05.2024 | |
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]JPH07166514 (MATSUO ENG KK) [X] 1,2,4,6,7 * the whole document * [A] 9-12 [I] 5,8; | [A]JPH10184032 (KUMAGAI GUMI CO LTD) [A] 9-12* the whole document *; | [A]JPH1150675 (TAISEI CORP) [A] 8 * the whole document *; | [XAI]JP2000086169 (NONAKA HARUO) [X] 1,3-7 * the whole document * [A] 9-12 [I] 2,8; | [A]US2004000103 (CHEN CHING-SHYANG [TW], et al) [A] 8 * paragraphs [0005] , [0023]; figures 1-16 *; | [XA]DE20317225U (SCHOECK ENTWICKLUNGSGMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5 * the whole document * [A] 6-12; | [XAI]KR20040069098 (ULSAN IND EDUCATION FOUNDATION) [X] 1-3,6 * the whole document * [A] 9-12 [I] 5,8 | Examination | DE20317225U | by applicant | JPH07166514 | DE20317225U | KR20040069098 |