EP4240108 - METHOD OF CONTROLLING A COOKING SYSTEM AND RELATED COOKING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Whirlpool Corporation 2000 North M-63 MD 3601 Benton Harbor, MI 49022 / US | [2023/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boccotti, Alessandro 21024 Cassinetta di Biandronno (VA) / IT | 02 /
Gallivanoni, Andrea 21024 Cassinetta di Biandronno (VA) / IT | 03 /
Mannara, Gaia 21024 Cassinetta di Biandronno (VA) / IT | 04 /
Pacioni, Annalisa 21024 Cassinetta di Biandronno (VA) / IT | 05 /
Parachini, Davide 21024 Cassinetta di Biandronno (VA) / IT | 06 /
Pastore, Cristiano Vito 21024 Cassinetta di Biandronno (VA) / IT | [2023/36] | Representative(s) | PGA S.p.A., Milano, Succursale di Lugano Via Castagnola, 21c 6900 Lugano / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2023/36] | Spina, Alessandro Whirlpool Management EMEA S.R.L. Via Carlo Pisacane, 1 20016 Pero (MI) / IT | Application number, filing date | 22160270.9 | 04.03.2022 | [2023/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4240108 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/06 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
H05B6/062 (EP);
F24C7/083 (US);
F24C7/087 (US);
H05B2213/07 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] |
Former [2023/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINES KOCHSYSTEMS UND ENTSPRECHENDES KOCHSYSTEM | [2023/36] | English: | METHOD OF CONTROLLING A COOKING SYSTEM AND RELATED COOKING SYSTEM | [2023/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN SYSTÈME DE CUISSON ET SYSTÈME DE CUISSON ASSOCIÉ | [2023/36] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/15] | 04.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2005016990 (WILKINS PETER RAVENSCROFT [GB], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0055]; figure 1 * [I] 2-4,6-8,10; | [XI]JP2008262930 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,5,9 * abstract * [I] 2-4,6-8,10; | [XI]US2009314771 (OKADA KAZUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,5,9 * paragraph [0048]; figure 1 * [I] 2-4,6-8,10; | [XI]JP4765368B (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,5,9 * abstract *[I] 2-4,6-8,10; | [XI]JP4896695B (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,5,9 * abstract * [I] 2-4,6-8,10; | [XI]JP5109963B (PANASONIC CORP) [X] 1,5,9 * abstract * [I] 2-4,6-8,10; | [XI]EP3340737 (VESTEL ELEKTRONIK SANAYI VE TICARET AS [TR]) [X] 1,5,9 * paragraph [0021]; figure 1 * [I] 2-4,6-8,10; | [XI]US2022065457 (BAILEY SAMUEL GERARD [GB]) [X] 1,5,9 * paragraph [0185] - paragraph [0187]; figures 1,2,5 * [I] 2-4,6-8,10 | by applicant | WO2017143146 | WO2018049276 | WO2018145088 |