EP4093007 - IMAGE FORMING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 21.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba Tec Kabushiki Kaisha 1-11-1, Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8562 / JP | [2022/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawasaki, Yuki Tokyo, 141-8562 / JP | [2022/47] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/47] | Application number, filing date | 22160434.1 | 07.03.2022 | [2022/47] | Priority number, date | JP20210085298 | 20.05.2021 Original published format: JP 2021085298 | [2022/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4093007 | Date: | 23.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4093007 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00, H04N1/32 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
H04N1/32138 (EP,US);
G06K19/0723 (CN,US);
G06K7/10297 (US);
G03G15/5091 (CN);
H04N1/00342 (EP);
H04N1/00925 (EP);
B41J29/38 (US);
G03G15/50 (US);
H04N2201/006 (EP);
H04N2201/3226 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/25] |
Former [2022/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/47] | English: | IMAGE FORMING DEVICE | [2022/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FORMATION D'IMAGES | [2022/47] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/25] | 16.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 27.03.2024 | FI | 27.03.2024 | HR | 27.03.2024 | LT | 27.03.2024 | LV | 27.03.2024 | NL | 27.03.2024 | SE | 27.03.2024 | NO | 27.06.2024 | RS | 27.06.2024 | GR | 28.06.2024 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/37] | BG | 27.03.2024 | |
FI | 27.03.2024 | ||
HR | 27.03.2024 | ||
LT | 27.03.2024 | ||
LV | 27.03.2024 | ||
SE | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.06.2024 | ||
RS | 27.06.2024 | ||
GR | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 27.03.2024 | |
FI | 27.03.2024 | ||
HR | 27.03.2024 | ||
LT | 27.03.2024 | ||
NO | 27.06.2024 | ||
RS | 27.06.2024 | ||
GR | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 27.03.2024 | |
NO | 27.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010110490 (MIZUMUKAI WATARU [JP]) [A] 1-13 * figure 2 *; | [A]EP2192759 (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13* figure 1 *; | [IA]EP3709088 (TOSHIBA TEC KK [JP]) [I] 1,2,13 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0056] - [0057] - [0069]; figures 5-7,9 * [A] 3-12 | Examination | US2007133039 |