EP4059666 - MANUALLY OPERATED WORK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.06.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Andreas Stihl AG & Co. KG Badstrasse 115 71336 Waiblingen / DE | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANDEL, Roland 70239 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
HEFTI, Jonas 70176 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
BEJBLIK, Jan 15000 Prague / CZ | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Reinhardt, Annette, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner mbB Menzelstraße 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 22160598.3 | 07.03.2022 | [2022/38] | Priority number, date | EP20210162602 | 15.03.2021 Original published format: EP 21162602 | [2022/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4059666 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4059666 | Date: | 21.12.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4059666 | Date: | 25.09.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B25F5/02 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
B25F5/02 (EP,US);
A01D34/416 (US);
A01D34/824 (US);
A01D34/90 (US);
A01D2101/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/28] |
Former [2022/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HANDGEFÜHRTES ARBEITSGERÄT MIT EINEM FÜHRUNGSROHR | [2022/38] | English: | MANUALLY OPERATED WORK DEVICE | [2022/38] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAVAIL GUIDÉ À LA MAIN | [2022/38] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/28] | 05.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24194089.9 / EP4434687 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2746008 (STIHL AG & CO KG ANDREAS [DE]); | [IAY]EP2875904 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]EP3760025 (STIHL AG & CO KG ANDREAS [DE]); | [XAY]CN112470737 (STIHL AG & CO KG) | by applicant | DE102014006910 |