EP4057342 - A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICES AND CORRESPONDING SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.06.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20864 Agrate Brianza (MB) / IT | For all designated states STMicroelectronics, Inc. No. 9 Mountain Drive Light Industry & Science Park II Brgy la Mesa 4027 Calamba City, Laguna / PH | [2022/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FONTANA, Fulvio Vittorio I-20900 Monza / IT | 02 /
BENELLI, Davide Maria I-26013 Crema (Cremona) / IT | 03 /
TALLEDO, Jefferson Sismundo 4027 Calamba, Laguna / PH | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [2024/44] |
Former [2022/37] | Bosotti, Luciano Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 22160653.6 | 08.03.2022 | [2022/37] | Priority number, date | IT20210005759 | 11.03.2021 Original published format: IT202100005759 | [2022/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4057342 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4057342 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4057342 | Date: | 30.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/495, H01L23/31, H01L21/56 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
H01L23/49541 (EP,US);
H01L21/561 (EP);
H01L21/565 (US);
H01L23/16 (US);
H01L23/3107 (EP);
H01L23/3114 (US);
H01L23/49548 (EP);
H01L23/49586 (EP);
H01L23/562 (EP);
H01L24/97 (EP);
H01L2224/32245 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP);
H01L2224/48245 (US);
H01L2224/48247 (EP);
H01L2224/48257 (EP);
H01L2224/73265 (EP);
H01L2224/83001 (EP);
H01L2224/85001 (EP);
H01L2224/97 (EP);
H01L24/32 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L24/73 (EP);
H01L24/83 (EP);
H01L24/85 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00012 (EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48257, H01L2924/00012 (EP);
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00012 (EP);
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48257, H01L2924/00012 (EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] |
Former [2022/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON HALBLEITERBAUELEMENTEN UND ENTSPRECHENDES HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT | [2022/37] | English: | A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICES AND CORRESPONDING SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2022/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE DISPOSITIFS SEMI-CONDUCTEURS ET DISPOSITIF SEMI-CONDUCTEUR CORRESPONDANT | [2022/37] | Examination procedure | 27.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 27.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60195955 (HITACHI LTD, et al); | [XI]US2013277817 (TAKEUCHI YUKIHARU [JP]); | [X]EP3098841 (ST MICROELECTRONICS SRL [IT]) | by applicant | US2013277817 | EP3098841 |