EP4056326 - IMPACT WRENCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.10.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CEMBRE S.p.A. Via Serenissima 9 25135 Brescia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/37] | For all designated states CEMBRE S.p.A. Via Serenissima 9 I-25135 Brescia / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAREZZANI, Gualtiero I-25135 BRESCIA / IT | 02 /
LUCIANI, Gianpaolo I-25135 BRESCIA / IT | [2022/37] | Representative(s) | Leihkauf, Steffen Falk, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [2022/37] | Application number, filing date | 22161319.3 | 10.03.2022 | [2022/37] | Priority number, date | IT20210005933 | 12.03.2021 Original published format: IT202100005933 | [2022/37] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4056326 | Date: | 14.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B25F5/00, B25F5/02, B25B21/02 | [2022/37] | CPC: |
B25B21/02 (EP,US);
B25B23/1475 (US);
B25B23/16 (US);
B25F5/00 (EP);
B25F5/006 (EP,US);
B25F5/008 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/46] |
Former [2022/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLAGWERKZEUG | [2022/37] | English: | IMPACT WRENCH | [2022/37] | French: | OUTIL D'IMPACT | [2022/37] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2022 | Examination requested [2022/46] | 10.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0246212 (SUNDSTROM ESKIL); | [A]WO2005113200 (CEMBRE SPA [IT], et al); | [YA]GB2429257 (BRYAR GROUP LTD [GB]); | [YA]DE102012221517 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [Y]WO2019207424 (CEMBRE SPA [IT]); | [A]WO2019228609 (ROBEL BAHNBAUMASCHINEN GMBH [DE]); | [A]US2020180124 (ELLICE JOSEPH H [US], et al) |