EP4067220 - PROPULSOR FOR MARINE VESSEL, AND MARINE VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008332 / JP | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSONO, Kazuki Tokyo, 1008332 / JP | 02 /
KAWABUCHI, Makoto Tokyo, 1008332 / JP | 03 /
YAMADA, Takuyoshi Tokyo, 1008332 / JP | 04 /
KUBOTA, Masaya Tokyo, 1008332 / JP | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 22161391.2 | 10.03.2022 | [2022/40] | Priority number, date | JP20210057913 | 30.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021057913 | [2022/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4067220 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B63H5/10, B63H5/14, B63H1/16 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
B63H5/10 (EP);
B63H1/16 (EP);
B63H5/14 (EP);
B63H2001/165 (EP);
Y02T70/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/10] |
Former [2022/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHIFFSANTRIEB UND SCHIFF | [2022/40] | English: | PROPULSOR FOR MARINE VESSEL, AND MARINE VESSEL | [2022/40] | French: | PROPULSEUR POUR NAVIRE MARIN ET NAVIRE MARIN | [2022/40] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/10] | 30.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5185545 (VERONESI LUCIANO [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * figures 1-7 * * column 4, lines 44-48 *; | [X]US2006063442 (TAYLOR DOUGLAS L [US], et al) [X] 1-7 * figures 1-13b * * paragraph [0026] *; | [X]US2010279559 (YOSHIKAWA KEIICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7* figures 1-14 *; | [X]DE102009040471 (TUTECH INNOVATION GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-7 * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0016] * | by applicant | JPS5992296 | JPS6044899 | JP2013100013 |