EP4060151 - EXTERNAL OPENING DEVICE WITH POLY-ARTICULATED PADDLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, SK | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akwel Vigo Spain SL Camino del Caramuxo 37 - 39 36213 Vigo Pontevedra / ES | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REGUEIRO BLANCO, Agustin 15008 A Coruna / ES | 02 /
GARCIA RODRIGUEZ, Julio 36003 Pontevedra / ES | [2023/02] |
Former [2022/38] | 01 /
REGUEIRO BLANCO, Agustin 15008 A CORUNA / ES | ||
02 /
GARCIA RODRIGUEZ, Julio 36003 PONTEVEDRA / ES | Representative(s) | Martin, Marie-Aude Akwel ZI du Prat 56000 Vannes / FR | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 22161544.6 | 11.03.2022 | [2022/38] | Priority number, date | FR20210002599 | 16.03.2021 Original published format: FR 2102599 | [2022/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4060151 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4060151 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E05B85/10 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
E05B85/103 (EP);
E05B85/10 (CN);
E05B79/06 (US);
B60J5/0413 (US);
B60J5/0415 (CN);
B60J5/0416 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] |
Former [2022/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | EXTERNE OFFNUNGSSTEUERUNG MIT POLY-ARTIKULIERTEM PADDEL | [2022/38] | English: | EXTERNAL OPENING DEVICE WITH POLY-ARTICULATED PADDLE | [2022/38] | French: | COMMANDE D'OUVERTURE EXTÉRIEURE À PALETTE POLY-ARTICULÉE | [2022/38] | Examination procedure | 16.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 16.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 27.12.2023 | ES | 27.12.2023 | HR | 27.12.2023 | PL | 27.12.2023 | RO | 27.12.2023 | RS | 27.12.2023 | SK | 27.12.2023 | SM | 27.12.2023 | NO | 27.03.2024 | GR | 28.03.2024 | IS | 27.04.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 27.12.2023 | |
ES | 27.12.2023 | ||
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
RO | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
SM | 27.12.2023 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
IS | 27.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/27] | ES | 27.12.2023 | |
HR | 27.12.2023 | ||
RS | 27.12.2023 | ||
NO | 27.03.2024 | ||
GR | 28.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 28.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2857684 (MECAPLAST SAM [MC]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1985784 (COUTIER MOULAGE GEN IND [FR]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2011080010 (GOUHARA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]DE102009045871 (HUF HUELSBECK & FUERST GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [AD]FR3034713 (RENAULT SA [FR]) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]FR3069003 (RENAULT SAS [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | FR3034713 |