EP4202307 - COMBUSTOR WITH A FUEL INJECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.12.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAN, Fei Schenectady, 12345 / US | 02 /
SAMARASINGHE, Ramal Janith Schenectady, 12345 / US | 03 /
NAIK, Pradeep Schenectady, 12345 / US | 04 /
VENKATESAN, Krishnakumar Schenectady, 12345 / US | 05 /
BUCARO, Michel Schenectady, 12345 / US | 06 /
PATRA, Ajoy Schenectady, 12345 / US | 07 /
GIRIDHARAN, Manampathy Schenectady, 12345 / US | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 22161672.5 | 11.03.2022 | [2023/26] | Priority number, date | US202163292227P | 21.12.2021 Original published format: US 202163292227 P | US202217677165 | 22.02.2022 Original published format: US202217677165 | [2023/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4202307 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F23R3/28 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
F23R3/28 (EP,CN);
F23R3/16 (US);
F02C3/00 (US);
F02C3/14 (CN);
F02C7/22 (US);
F23R3/36 (US);
F23R3/38 (CN);
F23R2900/00002 (EP);
F23R2900/00013 (CN);
F23R2900/00014 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/03] |
Former [2023/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNKAMMER MIT EINEM KRAFTSTOFFINJEKTOR | [2023/26] | English: | COMBUSTOR WITH A FUEL INJECTOR | [2023/26] | French: | CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION DOTÉE D'UN INJECTEUR DE CARBURANT | [2023/26] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/03] | 14.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2345957 (ABB ALSTOM POWER UK LTD [GB]); | [X]DE102004009226 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD BADEN [CH]); | [X]US2010089065 (TUTHILL RICHARD S [US]); | [A]US2013019602 (KIM KWANWOO [US], et al); | [X]US2017298875 (PATEL RAJESHRIBEN [GB], et al) |