Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] |
20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.03.2024 | New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | |
04.03.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
04.03.2024 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
05.11.2023 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
31.03.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
31.03.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.05.2023 [2023/18] |
31.03.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 03.05.2023 [2023/18] |
27.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
26.08.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] |
14.03.2022 | Change - representative |