EP4064756 - BANDWIDTH THROTTLING IN A RADIO ACCESS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, PL, PT, SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2024/08] |
Former [2022/39] | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKER, Daniel 91620 La Ville du Bois / FR | 02 /
SINHA, Goutam Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2024/08] | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2022/39] | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 22162174.1 | 15.03.2022 | [2022/39] | Priority number, date | US202117214435 | 26.03.2021 Original published format: US202117214435 | [2022/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4064756 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4064756 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/20, H04L47/25, H04M15/00, H04W28/02, H04L12/14, H04L47/22, H04W4/24, // H04W72/04 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
H04W28/20 (EP,CN);
H04W28/0925 (CN,US);
H04L12/1407 (EP);
H04L47/22 (EP);
H04L47/25 (EP);
H04M15/64 (EP);
H04M15/65 (EP);
H04M15/66 (EP,US);
H04M15/8016 (EP);
H04M15/8027 (EP);
H04M15/8033 (EP);
H04M15/8038 (EP);
H04M15/81 (US);
H04M15/8214 (EP);
H04M15/8228 (EP);
H04W28/0226 (EP,CN);
H04W28/0247 (EP);
H04W28/0284 (EP,US);
H04W28/0289 (EP,CN,US);
H04W28/082 (US);
H04W4/24 (EP,CN,US);
H04W72/52 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/39] | H04W28/20, H04L47/25, H04M15/00, H04W28/02, // H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] |
Former [2022/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BANDBREITENDROSSELUNG IN EINEM FUNKZUGANGSNETZWERK | [2022/39] | English: | BANDWIDTH THROTTLING IN A RADIO ACCESS NETWORK | [2022/39] | French: | LIMITATION DE BANDE PASSANTE DANS UN RÉSEAU D'ACCÈS RADIO | [2022/39] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 28.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.02.2024 | BG | 21.02.2024 | ES | 21.02.2024 | FI | 21.02.2024 | HR | 21.02.2024 | LT | 21.02.2024 | LV | 21.02.2024 | NL | 21.02.2024 | PL | 21.02.2024 | SE | 21.02.2024 | NO | 21.05.2024 | RS | 21.05.2024 | GR | 22.05.2024 | IS | 21.06.2024 | PT | 21.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 21.02.2024 | |
BG | 21.02.2024 | ||
ES | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 21.02.2024 | |
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 21.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP2512176 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [XI]US2014086052 (CAI YIGANG [US], et al); | [XI]WO2014146502 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [XI]US2015245238 (ZHANG SHUNLIANG [CN]) |