EP4060817 - POTENTIAL BALANCING SYSTEM AND MODULAR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2022 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DEHN SE Hans-Dehn-Straße 1 92318 Neumarkt i.d. OPf. / DE | [2022/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rother, Claudia 92318 Neumarkt i.d.Opf. / DE | 02 /
Seger, Siegfried 92318 Neumarkt i.d.Opf. / DE | 03 /
Wildfeuer, Sabine 92318 Neumarkt i.d.Opf. / DE | 04 /
Hannig, Martin 92318 Neumarkt i.d.Opf. / DE | [2022/38] | Representative(s) | Prinz & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [2022/38] | Application number, filing date | 22162225.1 | 15.03.2022 | [2022/38] | Priority number, date | DE202110106566 | 17.03.2021 Original published format: DE102021106566 | [2022/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4060817 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/48, H01R11/05, H02B1/00, H02G5/00 | [2022/38] | CPC: |
H01R11/05 (EP);
H01R4/485 (EP,US);
H01R4/4821 (EP,US);
H01R4/4833 (EP,US);
H02G13/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/03] |
Former [2022/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POTENTIALAUSGLEICHSSYSTEM UND BAUKASTENSYSTEM | [2022/38] | English: | POTENTIAL BALANCING SYSTEM AND MODULAR SYSTEM | [2022/38] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMPENSATION DE POTENTIEL ET SYSTÈME MODULAIRE | [2022/38] | Examination procedure | 13.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/03] | 13.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP24189459.1 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6261120 (BEEGE WERNER [DE], et al); | [XAY]DE20119510U (WAGO VERWALTUNGS GMBH [DE]); | [Y]EP2136437 (LEGRAND FRANCE [FR], et al); | [Y]US2012264327 (CARNEVALE JOHN [US], et al) |