EP4063629 - TURBOEXPANDER INTER-STAGE HEATING AND NH3 CRACKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RTX Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2023/44] |
Former [2022/39] | For all designated states Raytheon Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MacDONALD, Malcolm Bloomfield, 06002 / US | 02 /
EMERSON, Sean C. Broad Brook, 06016 / US | 03 /
HOLLEY, Brian M. Eastford, 06242-0341 / US | 04 /
SMITH, Lance L. West Hartford, 06117 / US | 05 /
COCKS, Peter South Glastonbury, 06073 / US | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/39] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 22162576.7 | 16.03.2022 | [2022/39] | Priority number, date | US202163164020P | 22.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163164020 P | US202217665063 | 04.02.2022 Original published format: US202217665063 | [2022/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4063629 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4063629 | Date: | 12.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F02C3/22, F02C7/224 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
F02C3/22 (EP,US);
F23R3/40 (US);
F02C3/20 (US);
F02C3/205 (US);
F02C3/30 (US);
F02C6/003 (US);
F02C7/224 (EP,US);
F05D2240/12 (US);
F05D2240/35 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] |
Former [2022/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TURBOEXPANDER MIT ZWISCHENSTUFENHEIZUNG UND NH3-CRACKING | [2022/39] | English: | TURBOEXPANDER INTER-STAGE HEATING AND NH3 CRACKING | [2022/39] | French: | CHAUFFAGE INTER-ÉTAGES DE TURBODÉTENDEUR ET CRAQUAGE DE NH3 | [2022/39] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 28.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US3740949 (WOLF R, et al); | [XAI]EP3517757 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [XI]WO2020189566 (MITSUBISHI HITACHI POWER SYS [JP]) |