EP4109264 - INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, INFORMATION PROCESSING PROGRAM, AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.11.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2022/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYASHITA, Ryo Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa, 211-8588 / JP | [2022/52] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Cheapside House 138 Cheapside London EC2V 6BJ / GB | [2022/52] | Application number, filing date | 22162819.1 | 17.03.2022 | [2022/52] | Priority number, date | JP20210105406 | 25.06.2021 Original published format: JP 2021105406 | [2022/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4109264 | Date: | 28.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/54, H04L49/00, H04L49/90 | [2022/52] | CPC: |
G06F9/546 (EP);
G06F9/45558 (US);
G06F9/5016 (US);
G06F9/5022 (US);
G06F9/544 (EP,US);
H04L49/70 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] |
Former [2022/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSPROGRAMM UND VERFAHREN ZUR INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNG | [2022/52] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, INFORMATION PROCESSING PROGRAM, AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING INFORMATION | [2022/52] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROGRAMME DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2022/52] | Examination procedure | 26.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 26.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2015370586 (COOPER TREVOR [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0061] ** figures 3,5 * | by applicant | JP2015197874 | JP2021048513 |