EP4064725 - METHOD FOR DYNAMIC SELECTION OF MICROPHONES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sagemcom Broadband SAS 4 Allée des Messageries 92270 Bois-Colombes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2023/52] | For all designated states Sagemcom Broadband SAS 4 Allée Des Messageries 92270 Bois-Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2022/39] | For all designated states SAGEMCOM BROADBAND SAS 250, route de l'Empereur 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGER, Jérôme 92500 RUEIL MALMAISON / FR | 02 /
NEDELCU, Radu 92500 RUEIL MALMAISON / FR | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Boettcher 5, rue de Vienne 75008 Paris / FR | [2024/29] |
Former [2022/39] | Lavaud, Thomas, et al Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 22162909.0 | 18.03.2022 | [2022/39] | Priority number, date | FR20210002859 | 23.03.2021 Original published format: FR 2102859 | [2022/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4064725 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4064725 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04R3/00, G01S3/802, // G10L25/51, H04R5/027, H04R1/40, G10L15/28 | [2024/08] | CPC: |
H04R3/00 (EP);
H04R3/005 (EP,US);
G01S3/802 (EP);
G10L15/08 (US);
G10L15/22 (US);
H04R1/406 (EP,US);
H04R29/005 (US);
G10L15/28 (EP);
G10L2015/088 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/39] | H04R3/00, // G10L25/51, H04R5/027, H04R1/40, G10L15/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] |
Former [2022/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHES AUSWAHLVERFAHREN VON MIKROFONEN | [2022/39] | English: | METHOD FOR DYNAMIC SELECTION OF MICROPHONES | [2022/39] | French: | PROCEDE DE SELECTION DYNAMIQUE DE MICROPHONES | [2022/39] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 10.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0131972 (ANDREA ELECTRONICS CORP [US]); | [XAI]KR20190104950 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [XI]CN111856402 (HAIER YOUJIA INTELLIGENT TECH BEIJING CO LTD) |