EP4063880 - LOAD CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SI | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yazaki Corporation 8-15, Konan 1-Chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2023/23] |
Former [2022/39] | For all designated states Yazaki Corporation 4-28, Mita 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8333 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamiya, Yukio Shizuoka, 421-0407 / JP | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/39] | Application number, filing date | 22162965.2 | 18.03.2022 | [2022/39] | Priority number, date | JP20210050051 | 24.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021050051 | [2022/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4063880 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4063880 | Date: | 21.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/327, H02H3/20 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
G01R31/3277 (EP);
H02H7/1203 (CN);
H02H7/20 (US);
H02H1/0007 (US);
H02H3/202 (EP);
H02M1/32 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/39] | Title | German: | LASTENSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/39] | English: | LOAD CONTROL DEVICE | [2022/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE CHARGE | [2022/39] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/39] | 26.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.2023 | CZ | 21.06.2023 | DK | 21.06.2023 | EE | 21.06.2023 | ES | 21.06.2023 | FI | 21.06.2023 | HR | 21.06.2023 | IT | 21.06.2023 | LT | 21.06.2023 | LV | 21.06.2023 | NL | 21.06.2023 | PL | 21.06.2023 | RO | 21.06.2023 | RS | 21.06.2023 | SE | 21.06.2023 | SI | 21.06.2023 | SK | 21.06.2023 | SM | 21.06.2023 | NO | 21.09.2023 | GR | 22.09.2023 | IS | 21.10.2023 | PT | 23.10.2023 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/22] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
DK | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
EE | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
PL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RO | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
PT | 23.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 21.06.2023 | |
CZ | 21.06.2023 | ||
ES | 21.06.2023 | ||
FI | 21.06.2023 | ||
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
IS | 21.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
SK | 21.06.2023 | ||
SM | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | FI | 21.06.2023 | |
HR | 21.06.2023 | ||
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
LT | 21.06.2023 | ||
LV | 21.06.2023 | ||
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/52] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
NL | 21.06.2023 | ||
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 21.06.2023 | |
RS | 21.06.2023 | ||
SE | 21.06.2023 | ||
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | ||
GR | 22.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | SE | 21.06.2023 | |
NO | 21.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]JP2013236297 (YAZAKI CORP) [I] 1-4 * paragraphs [0009] - [0036]; figures 1-3; claims 1-2 * [A] 5; | [A]US2017279443 (MORIMOTO MITSUAKI [JP]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0005] - [0083]; figures 1-8; claims 1-4 *; | [A]US2018323776 (BANGE PAUL [DE], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0020] - [0041]; figures 1-3; claims 1-20 *; | [A]US2019356161 (WAKAZONO KEISUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0003] - [0057]; figures 1-5; claims 1-4 *; | [A]DE102018212351 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0018] - [0052]; figures 1-5; claims 1-15 *; | [A]EP3754347 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-5* the whole document * | by applicant | JP2018133891 |