EP4245363 - A PARTICLE BEAM TRANSPORT SYSTEM FOR THE DELIVERY OF PARTICLE BEAM THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PAUL SCHERRER INSTITUT 5232 Villigen PSI / CH | [2023/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARADIA, Vivek 8142 Uitikon Waldegg / CH | 02 /
MEER, David 5200 Brugg / CH | 03 /
PSOROULAS, Serena 8050 Zürich / CH | 04 /
BAUMGARTEN, Christian 5244 Birrhard / CH | 05 /
LOMAX, Antony 5210 Windisch / CH | [2023/38] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Michael Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/38] | Application number, filing date | 22163081.7 | 18.03.2022 | [2023/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4245363 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
A61N5/1077 (EP);
A61N2005/1087 (EP);
A61N2005/1095 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TEILCHENSTRAHLTRANSPORTSYSTEM ZUR ABGABE VON TEILCHENSTRAHLTHERAPIE | [2023/38] | English: | A PARTICLE BEAM TRANSPORT SYSTEM FOR THE DELIVERY OF PARTICLE BEAM THERAPY | [2023/38] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRANSPORT DE FAISCEAU DE PARTICULES POUR L'ADMINISTRATION DE THÉRAPIE À FAISCEAU DE PARTICULES | [2023/38] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/34] | 12.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2011048088 (ION BEAM APPLIC [BE], et al) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y] - Bradley Joseph ET AL, "Initial Studies into Longitudinal Ionization Cooling for the Muon g-2 Experiment", doi:10.18429/jacow-ipac2018-tupmk015, (20180101), URL: https://accelconf.web.cern.ch/ipac2018/papers/tupmk015.pdf, (20220826), XP055955423 [Y] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.18429/jacow-ipac2018-tupmk015 | [A] - CARVER LAUREN ET AL, "Realistic modeling of a particle-matter-interaction system for controlling the momentum spread of muon beams", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH. SECTION A, ELSEVIER BV * NORTH-HOLLAND, NL, vol. 962, doi:10.1016/J.NIMA.2020.163704, ISSN 0168-9002, (20200227), (20200227), XP086086781 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nima.2020.163704 | [A] - STRATAKIS DIKTYS, "Application of passive wedge absorbers for improving the performance of precision-science experiments", PHYSICAL REVIEW ACCELERATORS AND BEAMS, vol. 22, no. 5, doi:10.1103/PhysRevAccelBeams.22.053501, (20190501), URL: https://journals.aps.org/prab/pdf/10.1103/PhysRevAccelBeams.22.053501, XP055955369 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevAccelBeams.22.053501 | [A] - DERBENEV Y ET AL, "Six-dimensional muon beam cooling in a continuous, homogeneous, gaseous hydrogen absorber", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH. SECTION A, ELSEVIER BV * NORTH-HOLLAND, NL, (20041011), vol. 532, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/J.NIMA.2004.06.085, ISSN 0168-9002, pages 470 - 473, XP004580953 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.nima.2004.06.085 | [A] - HANS BLATTMANN, "Monitoring and dosimetry of the biomed beam at SIN<1, 2>", ATOMKERNENERGIE (ATKE),, (19760101), vol. 27, no. 3, pages 173 - 174, XP001434772 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | [A] - NEUFFER D ET AL, "Simulation studies of ionization cooling", NUCLEAR INSTRUMENTS & METHODS IN PHYSICS RESEARCH. SECTION A, ELSEVIER BV * NORTH-HOLLAND, NL, (19980121), vol. 403, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0168-9002(97)01070-X, ISSN 0168-9002, pages 1 - 21, XP004108343 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-9002(97)01070-X |