EP4067593 - DEVICE FOR THE SUBSEQUENT THERMAL INSULATION, FORCE-TRANSMITTING CONNECTION OF A SECOND LOAD-BEARING BUILDING ELEMENT TO A FIRST LOAD-BEARING CONSTRUCTION ELEMENT AND CONSTRUCTION WITH SUCH A DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, PT | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leviat GmbH Liebigstraße 14 40764 Langenfeld / DE | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heidolf, Thorsten 99425 Weimar / DE | 02 /
Hollerbuhl, Lutz 06526 Sangerhausen / DE | 03 /
Keller, Tina 06268 Querfurt / DE | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Reinhardt, Annette, et al Patentanwälte Dipl.Ing. W. Jackisch & Partner mbB Menzelstraße 40 70192 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 22163162.5 | 21.03.2022 | [2022/40] | Priority number, date | DE202120101776U | 01.04.2021 Original published format: DE 202021101776 U | [2022/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4067593 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4067593 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/00 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
E04B1/0038 (EP,US);
E04B1/78 (US);
E04B5/16 (US);
E04B2001/7679 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/17] |
Former [2022/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUR NACHTRÄGLICHEN THERMISCH ISOLIERENDEN, KRAFTÜBERTRAGENDEN ANBINDUNG EINES ZWEITEN LASTAUFNEHMENDEN BAUWERKSTEILS AN EIN ERSTES LASTAUFNEHMENDES BAUWERKSTEIL UND BAUWERK MIT EINER SOLCHEN EINRICHTUNG | [2022/40] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE SUBSEQUENT THERMAL INSULATION, FORCE-TRANSMITTING CONNECTION OF A SECOND LOAD-BEARING BUILDING ELEMENT TO A FIRST LOAD-BEARING CONSTRUCTION ELEMENT AND CONSTRUCTION WITH SUCH A DEVICE | [2022/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LIAISON ULTÉRIEURE À ISOLATION THERMIQUE ET À TRANSFERT DE FORCE D'UNE SECONDE PARTIE D'OUVRAGE SUPPORTANT LA CHARGE À UNE PREMIÈRE PARTIE D'OUVRAGE SUPPORTANT LA CHARGE ET OUVRAGE DOTÉ D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF | [2022/40] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/17] | 23.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 28.02.2024 | ES | 28.02.2024 | HR | 28.02.2024 | LT | 28.02.2024 | LV | 28.02.2024 | RS | 28.05.2024 | GR | 29.05.2024 | IS | 28.06.2024 | PT | 28.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/35] | BG | 28.02.2024 | |
ES | 28.02.2024 | ||
HR | 28.02.2024 | ||
LT | 28.02.2024 | ||
RS | 28.05.2024 | ||
GR | 29.05.2024 | ||
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 28.02.2024 | |
IS | 28.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 28.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]KR101462801B (CHEONGWON CHEMICAL CO LTD [KR]); | [X]GB2567685 (INSULA LTD [GB]); | [XI]EP3613910 (IBALKON DARIUSZ GLAZA [PL]) | by applicant | WO2017086777 |