EP4202091 - FABRIC AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.05.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taya Canvas (Shanghai) Company Limited No.1, Qianming West Road Fengjing Industrial Park Shanghai 201501 / CN | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIN, I-Chien Shanghai / CN | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Becker, Eberhard Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 22163453.8 | 22.03.2022 | [2023/26] | Priority number, date | CN202111601962 | 24.12.2021 Original published format: CN202111601962 | [2023/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4202091 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | D01F1/02, D01F1/04, D01F1/10, D03D15/20, D03D15/54, D06C27/00 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
D01F1/10 (EP);
D03D15/54 (CN,KR,US);
D03D15/283 (CN);
D03D13/004 (US);
D01F1/02 (EP);
D01F1/04 (EP);
D04B1/126 (CN);
D04B1/16 (CN);
D04B21/08 (CN);
D05C15/04 (KR);
D05C17/02 (CN);
D06B3/10 (KR);
G09F13/04 (US);
G09F19/22 (KR);
D06B2700/36 (KR);
Y02P70/62 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEWEBE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2023/26] | English: | FABRIC AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREOF | [2023/26] | French: | TISSU ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2023/26] | Examination procedure | 22.03.2022 | Examination requested [2023/26] | 03.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN108410140 (ZHEJIANG ZHONGDI TEXTILE NEW MATERIAL TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XA]EP3227375 (RHODIA POLIAMIDA E ESPECIALIDADES LTDA [BR]) [X] 1-5,9,10 * paragraphs [0011] , [0022] , [0023] , [0034] , [0044] , [0045] , [0047] , [0048] , [0070] , [0071] , [0072]; claims 1,11 * [A] 6-8; | [A]CN110205702 (CHANGZHOU XINGXI GRAPHENE TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]CN111607839 (NANTONG QIANGSHENG GRAPHENE TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-10* the whole document * |