EP4063988 - DIFFUSOR WITH PRESSURE CONTROL PROPERTY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.06.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ebm-papst Landshut GmbH Hofmark-Aich-Strasse 25 84030 Landshut / DE | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Georgi, Plamen 84032 Altdorf / DE | 02 /
Stolz, Sebastian 84030 Ergolding / DE | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Otten, Roth, Dobler & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Großtobeler Straße 39 88276 Berg / Ravensburg / DE | [2022/39] | Application number, filing date | 22163567.5 | 22.03.2022 | [2022/39] | Priority number, date | DE202110107202 | 23.03.2021 Original published format: DE102021107202 | [2022/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4063988 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4063988 | Date: | 18.09.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G05D7/01, G05D7/00, G05D16/20, F16K1/00 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
G05D7/005 (EP);
G05D16/0666 (US);
F16K1/42 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] |
Former [2022/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | DIFFUSOR MIT DRUCKREGELEIGENSCHAFT | [2022/39] | English: | DIFFUSOR WITH PRESSURE CONTROL PROPERTY | [2022/39] | French: | DIFFUSEUR AVEC RÉGULATION DE PRESSION | [2024/25] |
Former [2022/39] | DIFFUSEUR À EFFET DE RÉGULATION DE PRESSION | Examination procedure | 28.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 28.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]DE102012102646 (EBM PAPST LANDSHUT GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP3026313 (KYB CORP [JP]); | [Y]US2017211481 (DENTON BRANDON [US]) | by applicant | DE102012102646 | DE102018102886 |