EP4071624 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING A MEMORY ACCESSIBLE VIA A JTAG INTERFACE, AND CORRESPONDING METHOD OF ACCESSING A MEMORY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.08.2023 [2023/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20864 Agrate Brianza (MB) / IT | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINNELLA, Filippo I-10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Bosotti, Luciano Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 22163845.5 | 23.03.2022 | [2022/41] | Priority number, date | IT20210008840 | 08.04.2021 Original published format: IT202100008840 | [2022/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4071624 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/38, G06F13/40 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
G06F13/385 (EP);
G06F13/4282 (CN);
G01R31/318555 (US);
G01R31/318572 (US);
G06F11/2733 (CN);
G06F13/4022 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/09] |
Former [2022/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM SPEICHER, DER ÜBER EINE JTAG-SCHNITTSTELLE ZUGÄNGLICH IST, UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN ZUM ZUGRIFF AUF EINEN SPEICHER | [2022/41] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING A MEMORY ACCESSIBLE VIA A JTAG INTERFACE, AND CORRESPONDING METHOD OF ACCESSING A MEMORY | [2022/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE COMPRENANT UNE MÉMOIRE ACCESSIBLE VIA UNE INTERFACE JTAG, ET PROCÉDÉ D'ACCÈS À UNE MÉMOIRE CORRESPONDANT | [2022/41] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2023 | Examination requested [2023/09] | 26.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US7587643 (CHOPRA RAJESH [US]) [X] 1-6,9 * figure 1 * * column 1 * * figure 3 * * column 3 - column 6 *[I] 7,8; | [A]US9766963 (DATTA SHAMANNA M [US], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]US10824530 (KUEHNIS ROLF H [FI], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * |