Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
20.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] |
20.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] |
01.03.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] |
26.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.02.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
09.02.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
09.02.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] |
10.11.2023 | Change - representative | |
25.08.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.09.2023 [2023/39] |
24.03.2022 | Change - representative |