EP4064480 - ELECTRICAL CONNECTION CABINET COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE EXTERNAL CONNECTION MODULE OF A SET OF EXTERNAL CONNECTION MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35 rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [2022/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINARES, Louis 38660 La Terrasse / FR | 02 /
BOUCHARD, Jean-Luc 38100 Grenoble / FR | 03 /
WASNER, Olivier 38320 Eybens / FR | [2022/39] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [2022/39] | Application number, filing date | 22164286.1 | 25.03.2022 | [2022/39] | Priority number, date | FR20210003076 | 26.03.2021 Original published format: FR 2103076 | [2022/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4064480 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02B11/04, H02B1/36, // H01R9/24 | [2022/39] | CPC: |
H02B11/04 (EP);
H02B1/308 (CN);
H02B1/30 (US);
H01R31/06 (CN);
H02B1/04 (CN);
H02B1/22 (CN);
H02B1/24 (CN);
H02B1/32 (CN);
H02B1/36 (EP,CN);
H02B11/173 (CN);
H02B7/06 (US);
H02J13/00001 (CN);
H02J13/00002 (CN);
H02J13/00016 (CN);
H02J13/00022 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] |
Former [2022/39] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANSCHLUSSSCHRANK, DER MINDESTENS EIN MODUL FÜR DEN EXTERNEN ANSCHLUSS AUS EINEM MODULSATZ UMFASST | [2022/39] | English: | ELECTRICAL CONNECTION CABINET COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE EXTERNAL CONNECTION MODULE OF A SET OF EXTERNAL CONNECTION MODULES | [2022/39] | French: | ARMOIRE ELECTRIQUE DE RACCORDEMENT COMPRENANT AU MOINS UN MODULE DE RACCORDEMENT EXTERNE D'UN JEU DE MODULES DE RACCORDEMENT EXTERNE | [2022/39] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 28.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3746817 (DROWN J, et al) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 62 - column 3, line 42; figure 1 *; | [A]DE29505257U (KLOECKNER MOELLER GMBH [DE]) [A] 3 * figure - *; | [AD]EP0926793 (SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC SA [FR]) [AD] 1-7 * paragraphs [0024] , [0 25] , [0 32]; figures 1, 2, 4, 5 *; | [A]JP2003143722 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 4,5 * figures 2, 3, 5 *; | [A]CN102386508 (CHANGZHOU XINYUANXING ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * figures 8-17 *; | [A]EP3163694 (ROCKWELL AUTOMATION TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029]; figures 7-10, 13, 17 *; | [A]EP3200293 (JEAN MÜLLER GMBH ELEKTROTECHNISCHE FABRIK [DE]) [A] 1-7* figures 1-4, 6 * | by applicant | EP0926793 |