EP4071020 - VEHICLE COLLISION AVOIDANCE ASSISTANCE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.09.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASHIMOTO, Sho Toyota-shi, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
SHIMANAKA, Yumi Toyota-shi, 471-8571 / JP | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 22164463.6 | 25.03.2022 | [2022/41] | Priority number, date | JP20210064011 | 05.04.2021 Original published format: JP 2021064011 | [2022/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4071020 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60W30/09, B60W10/184, B60W10/20 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
B60W30/09 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B60T17/22 (KR);
B60T7/04 (KR);
B60W10/18 (KR);
B60W10/184 (EP,CN);
B60W10/20 (EP,CN,KR);
B60W30/095 (US);
B60W30/0953 (CN,US);
B60W30/0956 (CN,US);
B60W30/181 (KR);
B60W40/02 (KR);
B60W40/068 (KR);
B60W40/076 (KR);
B60W40/105 (KR);
B60W2040/0818 (EP);
B60W2050/0005 (KR);
B60W2510/182 (EP,US);
B60W2510/186 (EP);
B60W2520/04 (KR);
B60W2520/06 (EP);
B60W2520/10 (KR,US);
B60W2520/105 (EP);
B60W2530/10 (EP,US);
B60W2540/049 (EP,US);
B60W2540/12 (EP,KR,US);
B60W2552/15 (EP,KR,US);
B60W2552/40 (EP,KR,US);
B60W2554/4041 (KR,US);
B60W2554/4044 (EP);
B60W2554/802 (EP);
B60W2554/804 (EP);
B60W2710/18 (US);
B60W2710/20 (US);
B60W50/0097 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ASSISTENZVORRICHTUNG ZUR KOLLISIONSVERMEIDUNG BEI FAHRZEUGEN | [2022/41] | English: | VEHICLE COLLISION AVOIDANCE ASSISTANCE DEVICE | [2022/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AIDE D'ÉVITEMENT DE COLLISION DE VÉHICULE | [2022/41] | Examination procedure | 25.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/41] | 29.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]US2015353133 (MUKAI YASUHIKO [JP]); | [XA]EP3135550 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [YA]US9701307 (NEWMAN DAVID E [US], et al); | [XAI]US2019143966 (MUKAI YASUHIKO [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2017043262 |