EP4163056 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING A PROPOSAL FOR OPTIMAL ADJUSTMENT OF A SHEET METAL WORKING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKU Maschinenbau GmbH Siemensstrasse 11 76532 Baden-Baden / DE | [2023/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burtscher, Jacques 67480 Roeschwoog / FR | [2023/15] | Representative(s) | Durm Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Moltkestrasse 45 76133 Karlsruhe / DE | [2023/15] | Application number, filing date | 22164497.4 | 25.03.2022 | [2023/15] | Priority number, date | DE202110125911 | 06.10.2021 Original published format: DE102021125911 | [2023/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4163056 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B24B27/00, B24B51/00, G05B19/4065, B24B21/00, G05B19/4093, B24B49/18 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
B24B27/0023 (EP);
B21C51/00 (US);
B24B21/008 (EP);
B24B49/183 (EP);
B24B51/00 (EP);
G05B19/401 (EP);
G05B2219/45234 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] |
Former [2023/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BEREITSTELLEN EINES VORSCHLAGS ZUR OPTIMALEN EINSTELLUNG EINER BLECHBEARBEITUNGSMASCHINE | [2023/15] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING A PROPOSAL FOR OPTIMAL ADJUSTMENT OF A SHEET METAL WORKING MACHINE | [2023/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE FOURNITURE D'UNE PROPOSITION DE RÉGLAGE OPTIMAL D'UNE MACHINE À TRAVAILLER LA TÔLE | [2023/15] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | 11.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE19915909 (STEINEMANN AG ST GALLEN [CH]) [X] 1-8,10-15 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraphs [0005] , [0036] * * figure 1; claims 1,2,4,7-9,15,18,20 * * paragraphs [0013] , [0016] , [0017] * [I] 9; | [XI]DE102019107694 (HOMAG BOHRSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-8,10-15 * paragraphs [0015] , [0018] , [0020] , [0023] , [0024] , [0026] * * paragraphs [0037] - [0057]; figure 1 * [I] 9; | [Y]DE102020201751 (FANUC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0021] ** paragraph [0036] *; | [YD]DE202020107308U (ARKU MASCHB GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-15 * figure 1 * | by applicant | DE202020107308U |