EP4070998 - ACCESS SYSTEM FOR A VEHICLE WITH A MODULAR STEP HOUSING AND VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bode - Die Tür GmbH Ochshäuser Straße 14 34123 Kassel / DE | [2022/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cimmino, Marco 37139 Adelebsen / DE | [2022/41] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bauer Vorberg Kayser Partnerschaft mbB Goltsteinstraße 87 50968 Köln / DE | [2022/41] | Application number, filing date | 22164717.5 | 28.03.2022 | [2022/41] | Priority number, date | DE202110108468 | 01.04.2021 Original published format: DE102021108468 | [2022/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4070998 | Date: | 12.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60R3/02, B61D23/02 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
B60R3/02 (EP);
B61D23/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/20] |
Former [2022/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSTIEGSYSTEM FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG MIT EINER MODULAR AUSGEBILDETEN TRITTKASSETTE, SOWIE FAHRZEUG | [2022/41] | English: | ACCESS SYSTEM FOR A VEHICLE WITH A MODULAR STEP HOUSING AND VEHICLE | [2022/41] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ACCÈS POUR UN VÉHICULE DOTÉ D'UN CAISSON DE MARCHE MODULAIRE, AINSI QUE VÉHICULE | [2022/41] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/20] | 12.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5775232 (GOLEMIS FOTIOS [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 3, 4 *; | [XI]DE202006016432U (BODE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-10 * the whole document * [I] 3; | [A]US7451512 (FULLERTON KEVIN JOHN [AU], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 1a, 1b, 1c *; | [A]CN104554284 (SHANGHAI JIACHENG RAILWAY TRANSP SAFETY SYSTEM CO LTD) [A] 1-10* figures 1, 2, 4, 5 * |