Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.04.2024 | New entry: Observations by third parties | |
21.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.05.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
03.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
30.09.2022 | Publication of search report | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] |
30.09.2022 | Change - classification | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] |
30.09.2022 | Change - classification | published on 02.11.2022 [2022/44] |
02.09.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.10.2022 [2022/40] |
02.09.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.10.2022 [2022/40] |
30.03.2022 | Change - representative |