Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022320649 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202110341771 | 30.03.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113097617 | Global Dossier | 09.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202110341771 | 30.03.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4068450 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2022 | A3 | EP4068450 | 05.10.2022 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CN202110341771 | 30.03.2021 |