Designated contracting states | AL | | AT | | BE | | BG | | CH | | CY | | CZ | | DE | | DK | | EE | | ES | | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | | HR | | HU | | IE | | IS | | IT | | LI | | LT | | LU | | LV | | MC | | MK | | MT | | NL | | NO | | PL | | PT | | RO | | RS | | SE | | SI | | SK | | SM | | TR | | Validation states | KH | | MA | | MD | | TN | | Examination procedure | 29.04.2024 | Observations by third parties | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 05.10.2022 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20220328 | | Event date: | 05.10.2022 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | | Event date: | 30.09.2022 | | Event description: | SEARCH REPORT DESPATCHED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009013 | | Event date: | 02.09.2022 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 02.09.2022 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE | | Event date: | 02.11.2022 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H01M 10/052 20100101AFI20220926BHEP | | Event date: | 02.11.2022 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H01M 50/105 20210101ALI20220926BHEP | | Event date: | 02.11.2022 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H01M 50/186 20210101ALI20220926BHEP | | Event date: | 02.11.2022 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H01M 50/193 20210101ALI20220926BHEP | | Event date: | 02.11.2022 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H01M 50/197 20210101ALI20220926BHEP | | Event date: | 02.11.2022 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H01M 50/198 20210101ALI20220926BHEP | | Event date: | 02.11.2022 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H01M 50/528 20210101ALI20220926BHEP | | Event date: | 02.11.2022 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H01M 50/531 20210101ALI20220926BHEP | | Event date: | 02.11.2022 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H01M 10/0525 20100101ALI20220926BHEP | | Event date: | 02.11.2022 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H01M 50/143 20210101ALI20220926BHEP | | Event date: | 02.11.2022 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H01M 50/124 20210101ALI20220926BHEP | | Event date: | 02.11.2022 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A3 | Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | | Event date: | 29.04.2024 | | Event description: | OBSERVATIONS FILED BY THIRD PARTIES | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNTIPA | |