EP4068450 - ELECTROCHEMICAL DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Observations by third parties | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ningde Amperex Technology Ltd. No.1 Xingang Road Zhangwan Town Jiaocheng District Fujian Province Ningde City, Fujian 352100 / CN | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FENG, Qin Ningde City, Fujian Province, 352100 / CN | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Icosa 83 avenue Denfert-Rochereau 75014 Paris / FR | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 22164785.2 | 28.03.2022 | [2022/40] | Priority number, date | CN202110341771 | 30.03.2021 Original published format: CN202110341771 | [2022/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4068450 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4068450 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/052, H01M50/105, H01M50/186, H01M50/193, H01M50/197, H01M50/198, H01M50/528, H01M50/531, H01M10/0525, H01M50/143, H01M50/124 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
H01M10/0525 (EP);
H01M50/186 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (CN);
B32B27/32 (CN);
H01M50/124 (EP);
H01M50/143 (EP);
H01M50/193 (EP,US);
H01M50/197 (EP,US);
H01M50/198 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/40] | H01M10/052, H01M50/105, H01M50/186, H01M50/193, H01M50/197, H01M50/198, H01M50/528, H01M50/531, H01M10/0525 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROCHEMISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2022/40] | English: | ELECTROCHEMICAL DEVICE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2022/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2022/40] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 02.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.04.2024 | Observations by third parties | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2629348 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2015372263 (DOUKE HIROKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0025] *; | [A]US2019123312 (IMAMOTO JUNYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [Y]EP3660941 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-13 * figure 2 * | other | JP2001297748 | EP3660941 |