Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4071683 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN202210342538 EP22164888 US202117224482 US202418668839



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2024311754Global Dossier 19.09.2024A1
Priority number Date
US202418668839 20.05.2024
US202117224482 07.04.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US11989685Global Dossier 21.05.2024B2
US2022327468 13.10.2022A1
Priority number Date
US202117224482 07.04.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN115249140Global Dossier 28.10.2022A
Priority number Date
US202117224482 07.04.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP4071683Global Dossier 12.10.2022A1
Priority number Date
US202117224482 07.04.2021