EP4067463 - ENGINE OILS WITH IMPROVED VISCOMETRIC PERFORMANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Afton Chemical Corporation 500 Spring Street Richmond, Virginia 23219 / US | [2023/36] |
Former [2022/40] | For all designated states Afton Chemical Corporation 500 Spring Street Richmond, Virginia 23219 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARRANZA, Arturo Glen Allen, 23060 / US | 02 /
HARRIS, Neil Richmond, 23209 / US | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/36] | Novagraaf Group Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | ||
Former [2022/40] | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22164898.3 | 29.03.2022 | [2022/40] | Priority number, date | US202117217286 | 30.03.2021 Original published format: US202117217286 | [2022/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4067463 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4067463 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C10M169/04, // C10N20/02, C10N20/04, C10N30/02, C10N30/08, C10N40/25, C10N70/00 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
C10M169/04 (EP);
C10M169/041 (CN,US);
C10M145/14 (US);
C10M149/22 (US);
C10M157/04 (US);
C10M169/044 (CN);
C10M177/00 (CN);
C10M2203/003 (US);
C10M2203/1025 (EP,CN);
C10M2205/02 (EP);
C10M2205/0285 (EP,CN);
C10M2209/08 (CN);
C10M2209/084 (EP,US);
C10M2215/08 (CN);
C10M2215/086 (CN);
C10M2215/28 (EP);
C10M2217/046 (US);
C10N2020/02 (EP,CN);
C10N2020/04 (EP,US);
C10N2020/071 (US);
C10N2030/02 (EP,CN);
C10N2030/04 (US);
C10N2030/06 (CN);
C10N2030/08 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C10M2203/1025, C10N2020/02 (EP);
C10M2209/08, C10N2020/04 (CN) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] |
Former [2022/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MOTORÖLE MIT VERBESSERTER VISKOSIMETRISCHER LEISTUNG | [2022/40] | English: | ENGINE OILS WITH IMPROVED VISCOMETRIC PERFORMANCE | [2022/40] | French: | HUILES MOTEUR PRÉSENTANT UNE MEILLEURE PERFORMANCE VISCOMÉTRIQUE | [2022/40] | Examination procedure | 30.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 30.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | [2024/27] |
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 06.09.2023 | |
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 06.09.2023 | |
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 06.09.2023 | |
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 06.12.2023 | |
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010190671 (STOEHR TORSTEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * par. 26, 162-163; claims 3, 33 *; | [A]US2018134983 (BROUTIN LAURA [FR], et al) [A] 1-15* example CL4; claim 19 * | by applicant | US3178663 | US3185647 | US3189544 | US3256185 | US3278550 | US3312619 | GB1065595 | US3366569 | US3390086 | US3403102 | US3458530 | US3470098 | US3502677 | US3519564 | US3546243 | US3573205 | US3634515 | US3649229 | US3708522 | US3749695 | US3859318 | US3865813 | US3865740 | US3954639 | US4152499 | US4234435 | US4259195 | US4259194 | US4261843 | US4263152 | US4265773 | US4272387 | US4283295 | US4285822 | US4379064 | US4482464 | GB2140811 | US4521318 | US4554086 | US4579675 | US4612132 | US4614522 | US4614603 | US4617137 | US4617138 | US4636322 | US4645515 | US4647390 | US4646860 | US4648980 | US4648886 | US4652387 | US4663062 | US4663064 | US4666460 | US4666459 | US4668246 | US4670170 | US4699724 | US4713189 | US4713191 | US4857214 | US4948386 | US4963275 | US4963278 | US4971711 | US4971598 | US4973412 | US4981492 | US5026495 | US5030249 | US5039307 | US5075383 | US5241003 | US5266223 | WO9406897 | US5334321 | EP0612839 | US5650381 | US5739355 | US5883057 | US6107257 | USRE37363E | US6300291 | US6331603 | US6723685 | WO2005087821 | USRE38929E | US7214649 | US7253231 | GB2440811 | USRE40595E | US7485603 | US7645726 | US7732390 | US7786057 | US7897696 | US8048831 | US2012101017 | WO2018US37116 |