EP4075309 - SECURE BOOT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 855 S. Mint Street Charlotte, NC 28202 / US | [2022/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOR, Ralf Peter Charlotte, 28202 / US | 02 /
SUNDARESH, Nagaraja Charlotte, 28202 / US | 03 /
VINCENT, Francois Charlotte, 28202 / US | 04 /
DURGAM, Pradeep Charlotte, 28202 / US | [2022/42] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/42] | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited Cornerhouse 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 22164906.4 | 29.03.2022 | [2022/42] | Priority number, date | US202117231353 | 15.04.2021 Original published format: US202117231353 | [2022/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4075309 | Date: | 19.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/51 | [2022/42] | CPC: |
G06F21/575 (EP,US);
G06F9/4401 (CN);
G06F21/51 (CN);
G06F21/572 (EP,US);
G06F8/65 (CN);
G06F8/654 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM SICHEREN HOCHFAHREN | [2022/42] | English: | SECURE BOOT DEVICE | [2022/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉMARRAGE SÉCURISÉ | [2022/42] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/42] | 03.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US8914627 (PARK DONG-JIN [KR], et al) [I] 1-10 * column 1, line 34 - line 41 * * column 1, line 47 - line 53 * * column 6, line 64 - column 7, line 18 * * column 7, line 34 - line 52 ** column 8, line 41 - line 61 *; | [X]US2017293484 (HAASE BJÖRN [DE]) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0084] * |