EP4067469 - CLEANING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 18.09.2024 [2024/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gebert-Schwarzwaelder, Antje 41469 Neuss / DE | 02 /
Kreis, Michael 51377 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
Frey, Till 40479 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 22164907.2 | 29.03.2022 | [2022/40] | Priority number, date | DE202110203177 | 30.03.2021 Original published format: DE102021203177 | [2022/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4067469 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4067469 | Date: | 18.09.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/20, C11D3/37, C11D17/00, // C11D3/04, C11D17/04 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
C11D3/3753 (EP);
C11D17/003 (EP);
C11D3/2044 (EP);
C11D3/2065 (EP);
C11D3/3707 (EP);
C11D17/043 (EP);
C11D3/046 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/40] | C11D17/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSMITTEL | [2022/40] | English: | CLEANING AGENT | [2022/40] | French: | DÉTERGENT | [2022/40] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 09.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2019345422 (SUNDER MATTHIAS [DE], et al); | [A]US2020087597 (JU JIA [CN], et al) | Examination | US5510047 |