Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
02.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
08.05.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
27.04.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
01.09.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] |
30.03.2022 | Change - representative |