EP4254075 - DEVICE FOR REMOTE CONTROL OF A TIMEPIECE MOVEMENT OF A WATCH AND WATCH COMPRISING SAID CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harry Winston SA Chemin du Tourbillon, 8 1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONFERRER, Bernat 1162 St-Prex / CH | 02 /
DENOREAZ, Steven 39400 Bellefontaine / FR | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | ICB SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital, 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 22165358.7 | 30.03.2022 | [2023/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4254075 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G04B3/04, G04B27/00, G04B37/06 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
G04B27/001 (EP);
G04B27/00 (CN);
G04B3/046 (EP,US);
G04B27/08 (CN);
G04B3/12 (CN);
G04B37/066 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] |
Former [2023/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSETZTE STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG EINES UHRWERKS EINER ARMBANDUHR UND DIESE STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UMFASSENDE ARMBANDUHR | [2023/40] | English: | DEVICE FOR REMOTE CONTROL OF A TIMEPIECE MOVEMENT OF A WATCH AND WATCH COMPRISING SAID CONTROL DEVICE | [2023/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DÉPORTÉ D'UN MOUVEMENT HORLOGER D'UNE MONTRE ET MONTRE COMPRENANT LEDIT DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE | [2023/40] | Examination procedure | 08.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/16] | 08.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]CH689570 (TECHNOWATCH SA [CH]); | [A]EP1710635 (BRUNO AFFOLTER S A [CH]); | [A]EP3306421 (SWATCH GROUP RES & DEV LTD [CH]); | [XA]EP3396469 (MONTRES JAQUET DROZ SA [CH]) |