EP4083519 - EXHAUST HOOD AND METHOD FOR OPERATING AN EXHAUST HOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2022/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Graw, Martin 75045 Walzbachtal Wössingen / DE | 02 /
Jordan, Dietmar 75417 Mühlacker / DE | 03 /
Wössner, Markus 74374 Zaberfeld / DE | [2022/44] | Application number, filing date | 22165744.8 | 31.03.2022 | [2022/44] | Priority number, date | DE202110204156 | 27.04.2021 Original published format: DE102021204156 | [2022/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4083519 | Date: | 02.11.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/20 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
F24C15/2021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] |
Former [2022/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DUNSTABZUGSHAUBE UND VERFAHREN ZUM STEUERN EINER DUNSTABZUGSHAUBE | [2022/44] | English: | EXHAUST HOOD AND METHOD FOR OPERATING AN EXHAUST HOOD | [2022/44] | French: | HOTTE ASPIRANTE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UNE HOTTE ASPIRANTE | [2022/44] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 02.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102005045137 (MINEBEA CO LTD [JP]); | [XY]CN202350151U (FANG LIU); | [X]CN202424618U (GUANGZHOU AUKTECH TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [A]ITPD20110399 (LN 2 SRL SOCIO UNICO); | [X]DE102013015122 (DIEHL AKO STIFTUNG GMBH & CO [DE]); | [X]CN206531119U (SUN LIQUN); | [Y]US2019288629 (TRIPATHI ADYA S [US]); | [X]CN210179718U (GUANGDONG BOCHU INTELLIGENT TECH CO LTD) |