Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11274087 | ![]() | 15.03.2022 | B2 | US2021276965 | 09.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | HUP1600420 | 08.07.2016 | WO2017IB54094 | 07.07.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7065824B | ![]() | 12.05.2022 | B2 | JP2019527210 | 26.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | HUP1600420 | 08.07.2016 | HUP1700197 | 09.05.2017 | WO2017IB54094 | 07.07.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL264074 | ![]() | 31.10.2021 | B | IL264074 | 31.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | HUP1600420 | 08.07.2016 | HUP1700197 | 09.05.2017 | WO2017IB54094 | 07.07.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3481811 | ![]() | 25.05.2022 | B1 | EP3481811 | 15.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | HUP1600420 | 08.07.2016 | HUP1700197 | 09.05.2017 | WO2017IB54094 | 07.07.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN109476617B | ![]() | 04.04.2023 | B | CN109476617 | 15.03.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | HUP1600420 | 08.07.2016 | HUP1700197 | 09.05.2017 | WO2017IB54094 | 07.07.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3030102 | ![]() | 11.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | HUP1600420 | 08.07.2016 | HUP1700197 | 09.05.2017 | WO2017IB54094 | 07.07.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017292177B | ![]() | 29.07.2021 | B2 | AU2017292177 | 07.02.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | HUP1600420 | 08.07.2016 | HUP1700197 | 09.05.2017 | WO2017IB54094 | 07.07.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4043446 | ![]() | 18.01.2023 | A3 | EP4043446 | 17.08.2022 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2017IB54094 | 07.07.2017 | HUP1600420 | 08.07.2016 | HUP1700197 | 09.05.2017 | EP17739701 | 07.07.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112018077305 | 02.04.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | HUP1600420 | 08.07.2016 | HUP1700197 | 09.05.2017 | WO2017IB54094 | 07.07.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK3481811T | 05.09.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | HUP1600420 | 08.07.2016 | HUP1700197 | 09.05.2017 | WO2017IB54094 | 07.07.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA036312 | 26.10.2020 | B1 | EA201990097 | 28.06.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | HUP1600420 | 08.07.2016 | HUP1700197 | 09.05.2017 | WO2017IB54094 | 07.07.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2924995T | 13.10.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | HUP1600420 | 08.07.2016 | HUP1700197 | 09.05.2017 | WO2017IB54094 | 07.07.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20221037T | 11.11.2022 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017IB54094 | 07.07.2017 | HUP1600420 | 08.07.2016 | HUP1700197 | 09.05.2017 | EP17739701 | 07.07.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU231173 | 28.06.2021 | B1 | HUP1700197 | 28.09.2018 | A2 | Priority number | Date | HUP1600420 | 08.07.2016 | HUP1700197 | 09.05.2017 | WO2017IB54094 | 07.07.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT3481811T | 25.08.2022 | T | Priority number | Date | HUP1600420 | 08.07.2016 | HUP1700197 | 09.05.2017 | WO2017IB54094 | 07.07.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX388581 | 19.03.2025 | B | MX2019000330 | 20.05.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | HUP1600420 | 08.07.2016 | HUP1700197 | 09.05.2017 | WO2017IB54094 | 07.07.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX394013 | 24.03.2025 | B | MX2021012390 | 18.07.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | HUP1600420 | 08.07.2016 | HUP1700197 | 09.05.2017 | WO2017IB54094 | 07.07.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL3481811T | 12.09.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | HUP1600420 | 08.07.2016 | HUP1700197 | 09.05.2017 | WO2017IB54094 | 07.07.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS63480 | 31.08.2022 | B1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017IB54094 | 07.07.2017 | HUP1600420 | 08.07.2016 | HUP1700197 | 09.05.2017 | EP17739701 | 07.07.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG11201811291Q | 30.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | HUP1600420 | 08.07.2016 | HUP1700197 | 09.05.2017 | WO2017IB54094 | 07.07.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI3481811T | 28.10.2022 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2017IB54094 | 07.07.2017 | HUP1600420 | 08.07.2016 | HUP1700197 | 09.05.2017 | EP17739701 | 07.07.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA123797 | 02.06.2021 | C2 | Priority number | Date | HUP1600420 | 08.07.2016 | HUP1700197 | 09.05.2017 | WO2017IB54094 | 07.07.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018007986 | ![]() | 11.01.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | HUP1600420 | 08.07.2016 | HUP1700197 | 09.05.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | GEP20217217 | 10.02.2021 | B | Priority number | Date | HUP1600420 | 08.07.2016 | HUP1700197 | 09.05.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE059285T | 28.11.2022 | T2 | Priority number | Date | HUP1600420 | 08.07.2016 | HUP1700197 | 09.05.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT3481811T | 23.08.2022 | T | Priority number | Date | HUP1600420 | 08.07.2016 | HUP1700197 | 09.05.2017 | Type | ![]() | EP3481811 |