EP4067556 - LAUNDRY TREATMENT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu SEOUL 07336 / KR | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAM, Wansik 08592 Seoul / KR | 02 /
LIM, Hyunggyu 08592 Seoul / KR | 03 /
YOON, Taejun 08592 Seoul / KR | 04 /
JANG, Cheolmin 08592 Seoul / KR | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 22165888.3 | 31.03.2022 | [2022/40] | Priority number, date | KR20210043232 | 02.04.2021 Original published format: KR 20210043232 | [2022/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4067556 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | D06F58/12, // D06F73/02 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
D06F58/12 (EP,KR,US);
D06F58/10 (CN);
D06F58/20 (CN);
D06F58/24 (CN);
D06F58/26 (CN);
D06F58/44 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/06] |
Former [2022/40] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WÄSCHEBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2022/40] | English: | LAUNDRY TREATMENT APPARATUS | [2022/40] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DU LINGE | [2022/40] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 05.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006037209 (JOHNSON TROY A [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0021]; figure -; claim 1 * [I] 2-12; | [A]WO2011108865 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [XI]EP3722491 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-5,10 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0098]; figure - * [I] 6-9,11,12 | by applicant | KR101674942B | KR20210043232 |