EP4254998 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, IN PARTICULAR FOR TRANSMITTING MEASUREMENT DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brehme, Sebastian 76185 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
Fritz, Viktor 76187 Karlsruhe / DE | 03 /
Leist, Felix 68542 Heddesheim / DE | 04 /
Warth, Robin 76676 Graben-Neudorf / DE | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 22165986.5 | 31.03.2022 | [2023/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4254998 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/38, H04L67/12, H04W4/70, H04W84/18 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
H04W4/38 (EP);
H04L67/12 (EP);
H04W4/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEMS, INSBESONDERE ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON MESSDATEN, SOWIE DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2023/40] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A WIRELESS COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, IN PARTICULAR FOR TRANSMITTING MEASUREMENT DATA | [2023/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL, EN PARTICULIER DESTINÉ À LA TRANSMISSION DES DONNÉES DE MESURE, AINSI QUE SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL | [2023/40] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/36] | 26.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - JAE-HYUNG LEE ET AL, "ELBA: A New Efficient Load-Balancing Association in IEEE 802.15.4-Based Wireless Sensor Networks", IEICE TRANSACTION ON COMMUNICATION, COMMUNICATIONS SOCIETY, TOKYO, JP, vol. E95B, no. 5, doi:10.1587/TRANSCOM.E95.B.1830, ISSN 0916-8516, (20120501), pages 1830 - 1833, (20120501), XP001575251 [X] 1-4,12-16 * Abschnitt "Summary" * * Abschnitt 2 * [I] 5-11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1587/transcom.E95.B.1830 | [XI] - AHMED ELSAIFY ET AL, "Gwmac", PERFORMANCE EVALUATION OF WIRELESS AD HOC, SENSOR,AND UBIQUITOUS NETWORKS, ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701 NEW YORK NY 10121-0701 USA, (20071022), doi:10.1145/1298197.1298208, ISBN 978-1-59593-808-4, pages 54 - 61, XP058136460 [X] 1-5,9-16 * abstract * * Abschnitt 4.2.3 * * Abschnitt 4.3.1 * * Abschnitt 4.3.2 * [I] 6-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1298197.1298208 | by applicant | US2019349831 | CN111629451 | CN112969167 |