EP4252719 - CONTROLLED AND PRECISE STENT PLACEMENT AT A CORONARY OSTIUM IN PERCUTANEOUS CORONARY INTERVENTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Erasmus University Rotterdam Medical Center Dr. Molewaterplein 50 3015 GE Rotterdam / NL | [2023/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSCHUT, Jeroen Maarten 3015 GE Rotterdam / NL | [2023/40] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2023/40] | Application number, filing date | 22166334.7 | 01.04.2022 | [2023/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4252719 | Date: | 04.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/958, A61M25/00, // A61F2/954 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
A61F2/958 (EP);
A61F2/954 (EP);
A61F2002/821 (EP);
A61F2250/0008 (EP);
A61M2025/1068 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KONTROLLIERTE UND PRÄZISE STENTPLATZIERUNG AN EINEM KORONAROSTIUM BEI PERKUTANEN KORONAREN EINGRIFFEN | [2023/40] | English: | CONTROLLED AND PRECISE STENT PLACEMENT AT A CORONARY OSTIUM IN PERCUTANEOUS CORONARY INTERVENTIONS | [2023/40] | French: | MISE EN PLACE CONTRÔLÉE ET PRÉCISE D'UN STENT AU NIVEAU D'UN OSTIUM CORONAIRE LORS D'INTERVENTIONS CORONARIENNES PERCUTANÉES | [2023/40] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/35] | 25.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011190708 (SHAKED YOAV [IL], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0121] - [0128]; figures 14a-18c *; | [ID]WO2019156560 (UNIV ERASMUS MED CT ROTTERDAM [NL]) [ID] 1-15 * page 5, line 26 - page 12, line 29; figures 1a-3c * | by applicant | US2017274179 | WO2019156560 |