EP4257908 - ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE AND METHOD FOR STORING ENERGY USING SERIALLY CONNECTED THERMAL ENERGY STORAGE UNITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.09.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E2S POWER AG Landstrasse 99 5430 Wettingen / CH | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pancheshnyi, Sergey 8051 Zürich / CH | 02 /
Nenadic, Zoran 11000 Belgrade / RS | 03 /
Savic, Sasha 5430 Wettingen / CH | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Rutz, Andrea Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 22166689.4 | 05.04.2022 | [2023/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4257908 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F28D20/00 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
F28D20/0056 (EP);
F28D2020/0078 (EP);
F28D2020/0082 (EP);
F28F2250/06 (EP);
Y02E60/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENERGIESPEICHERVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM SPEICHERN VON ENERGIE UNTER VERWENDUNG SERIELL VERBUNDENER EINHEITEN ZUM SPEICHERN VON THERMISCHER ENERGIE | [2023/41] | English: | ENERGY STORAGE DEVICE AND METHOD FOR STORING ENERGY USING SERIALLY CONNECTED THERMAL ENERGY STORAGE UNITS | [2023/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE ET PROCÉDÉ DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE AU MOYEN D'UNITÉS DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE THERMIQUE CONNECTÉES EN SÉRIE | [2023/41] | Examination procedure | 12.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/37] | 03.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YDA]WO2020254001 (E2S POWER AG [CH]) [YD] 8-10 * abstract * * page 22, line 17 - page 23, line 12 * * page 28, line 27 - page 29, line 18 * [A] 1-7,11-13; | [XYI]US2021172685 (BERGAN PÅL G [NO], et al) [X] 1-4,11,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [00 2] , [0 52] - [0055] - [0 81] , [0 95] - [0100] * [Y] 8-10 [I] 5-7,13; | [YA]CN114041036 (E2S POWER AG) [Y] 8-10 * abstract *[A] 1-7,11-13 | by applicant | US4136276 | WO9114906 | DE4410440 | WO2004072452 | WO2005088218 | EP1666828 | WO2012038620 | US2012085087 | DE102011112280 | CN103353060 | WO2014063191 | WO2016176174 | WO2019149623 | WO2020254001 |