Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
03.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.05.2023 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | |
12.05.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
12.05.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] |
12.05.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 14.06.2023 [2023/24] |
10.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
10.05.2023 | New entry: Receipt of request for further processing | |
10.05.2023 | New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing | |
23.09.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.10.2022 [2022/43] |
06.04.2022 | Change - representative |