Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11511947 | Global Dossier | 29.11.2022 | B2 | US2022332521 | 20.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117233609 | 19.04.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115213124 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | US202117233609 | 19.04.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4079664 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202117233609 | 19.04.2021 |