Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4257929 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4257929



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(40)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 187
03.09.2024 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
25.07.2024 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
15.07.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.07.2024 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
15.07.2024 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
15.07.2024 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
20.03.2024 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
20.03.2024 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
20.03.2024 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
20.03.2024 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
20.03.2024 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 22
20.03.2024 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 23
05.03.2024 Examination started Search / examination 1
20.12.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.12.2023 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
20.12.2023 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
20.12.2023 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 14
20.12.2023 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 14
20.12.2023 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 7
20.12.2023 Annex Search / examination 1
20.12.2023 Annex Search / examination 1
20.12.2023 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
20.12.2023 Summary of subsequently filed documents Search / examination 2
16.10.2023 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
13.09.2023 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
21.03.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
12.10.2022 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.10.2022 European search opinion Search / examination 6
12.10.2022 European search report Search / examination 2
12.10.2022 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
04.06.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
04.06.2022 Abstract Search / examination 1
04.06.2022 Claims Search / examination 4
04.06.2022 Description Search / examination 13
04.06.2022 Drawings Search / examination 4
04.06.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.04.2022 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
06.04.2022 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.04.2022 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
06.04.2022 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 22