EP4053134 - METHOD OF STABILIZING IMINO-FUNCTIONAL SILANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Momentive Performance Materials Inc. 260 Hudson River Road Waterford, NY 12188 / US | [2022/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cruse, Richard, W. Yorktown Heights, NY 10589 / US | 02 /
Pinnow, Matthew Millwood, NY 10546 / US | [2022/36] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [2022/36] | Application number, filing date | 22167587.9 | 14.07.2017 | [2022/36] | Priority number, date | US201662362741P | 15.07.2016 Original published format: US 201662362741 P | [2022/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4053134 | Date: | 07.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/18, C07F7/20 | [2022/36] | CPC: |
C07F7/1804 (EP,US);
C07F7/1872 (KR);
C07F7/20 (EP,KR,US);
C01D1/02 (US);
C01D1/04 (US);
C07C31/04 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/15] |
Former [2022/36] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STABILISIERUNG VON IMINOFUNKTIONELLEM SILAN | [2022/36] | English: | METHOD OF STABILIZING IMINO-FUNCTIONAL SILANE | [2022/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE STABILISATION DE SILANE À FONCTIONNALITÉ IMINO | [2022/36] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/15] | 03.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17746239.7 / EP3484898 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2013090885 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4-13 * example 5-6 page 29 *; | [I]US2013281562 (BURCKHARDT URS [CH]) [I] 1-13 * example 2 pages 15-16 *; | [X] - LU HSU-TUNG ET AL, "Fabrication of organosilica hollow spheres using organosiloxane-templated sol-gel process", JOURNAL OF SOL-GEL SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 76, no. 2, doi:10.1007/S10971-015-3842-X, ISSN 0928-0707, (20150819), pages 465 - 468, (20150819), XP035533382 [X] 1,2,4-13 * page 466 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10971-015-3842-x | [X] - MCKITTRICK MICHAEL W. ET AL, "Toward Single-Site Functional MaterialsPreparation of Amine-Functionalized Surfaces Exhibiting Site-Isolated Behavior", CHEMISTRY OF MATERIALS, US, (20030211), vol. 15, no. 5, doi:10.1021/cm020952z, ISSN 0897-4756, pages 1132 - 1139, XP055941471 [X] 1,2,4-13 * page 1135 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm020952z | by applicant | US2942019 | US3681420 | US5134234 | US5739201 | US6586612 | US6998449 | WO2009043599 | US7906673 | US7923572 | US8877955 | - R.G. BATESG.D. PINCHING, J. Am., Chem. Soc., (19500000), vol. 72, pages 1393 - 92 |