EP4079261 - LEAFLET ATTACHMENT FRAME FOR A PROSTHETIC VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.10.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Edwards Lifesciences Corporation One Edwards Way Irvine, CA 92614 / US | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENICHOU, Netanel IRVINE, CA, 92614 / US | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 31 02 60 80102 München / DE | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 22167589.5 | 15.12.2008 | [2022/43] | Priority number, date | US20071400707P | 14.12.2007 Original published format: US 1400707 P | [2022/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4079261 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/24 | [2022/43] | CPC: |
A61F2/2418 (EP,US);
A61F2/2412 (EP,US);
A61F2/2415 (US);
A61F2/2409 (EP,US);
A61F2210/0076 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0075 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0054 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | SEGELBEFESTIGUNGSRAHMEN FÜR EINE KLAPPENPROTHESE | [2022/43] | English: | LEAFLET ATTACHMENT FRAME FOR A PROSTHETIC VALVE | [2022/43] | French: | CADRE DE FIXATION DE FEUILLET POUR VALVE PROTHÉTIQUE | [2022/43] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 28.09.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08861196.7 / EP2231070 | EP13002630.5 / EP2628464 | EP19215387.2 / EP3643273 | EP21190923.9 / EP3981363 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 11.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 15.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO03047468 (PERCUTANEOUS VALVE TECHNOLOGIE [US], et al); | [A]WO2004082527 (EDWARDS LIFESCIENCES CORP [US], et al); | [XYI]US2005075728 (NGUYEN TUOC TAN [US], et al); | [Y]US2005234546 (NUGENT ALAN [US], et al); | [XP]WO2008150529 (ST JUDE MEDICAL [US], et al) | by applicant | US118 | US6730 | US6767362 | US6908481 | US2008154355 |