Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP4134018


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.12.2023 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  24.01.2024  [2024/04]
10.11.2023 Change - priority published on  13.12.2023  [2023/50]
07.09.2023 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
23.07.2023 New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit
13.01.2023 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  15.02.2023  [2023/07]
15.04.2022 Change - representative